skip to content

Tambakis, Maria Lynn

CPSO#: 93734

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Emergency Department
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4401 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Emergency Department/ Hospitalist
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

401 Sunset Ave
Student Health Services
CAW Student Center-Univ.of Windsor
Room 242
Windsor ON  N9B 3P4
Canada
Phone: 519-973-7002
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Tambakis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tambakis ( CPSO# 93734 )

Business Address:
University of Windsor - Student Health
CAW-242
401 Sunset Avenue
Windsor ON  N9B 3P4
Phone Number: (519) 973-7002

Business Address:
Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
Emergency Department
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4401

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIA LYNN TAMBAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMBAKIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012