skip to content

Tam, Wilfred Herbie Garcia

CPSO#: 90538

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
488 locust street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Phone: (905)703-1480
Fax: (905) 390-3578 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Canada
Phone: 9056323737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

3001 hospital gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

725 bronte street south
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

1 princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-0111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wilfred Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Tam ( CPSO# 90538 )

Business Address:
204 - 1A Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone Number: (905) 703-1480

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILFRED HERBIE GARCIA TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014