skip to content

Tam, Thomas Chi-Hung

CPSO#: 25706

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Tam, Tommy Chi-Hung (used until: 18 Jun 2002 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2772 Danforth Avenue
Suite 201
Toronto ON  M4C 1L7
Phone: (416) 691-2600 Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. M Ramprasad 204 - 2772 Danforth Ave Toronto ON M4C 1L7 Tel: 416-691-2600
Date Received: 23 Sep 2019

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. THOMAS CHI-HUNG TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1973