skip to content

Tam, Stephanie Hok-Yee

CPSO#: 86689

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1J 0C7
Phone: (905) 721-4960
Fax: (905) 721-4352 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tam ( CPSO# 86689 )

Business Address:
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4960

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1J 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Ajax
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE HOK-YEE TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012