skip to content

Tam, Robert Chi-Fan

CPSO#: 22200

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jul 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McGill University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert C.F. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: Glen Park Family Health 200-2920 Dufferin Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3S8
Date Received: 12 May 2020


Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can contact: Glen Park Family Health 200 - 2920 Dufferin St.,Toronto ON M6B 3S8 Tel: 416-782-2211
Date Received: 19 Dec 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020