skip to content

Tam, Diamond Yat Fai

CPSO#: 87388

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Jul 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prism Eye Institute
Unit 1
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone: (905) 456-3937 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Prism Eye Institute
Suite 605
7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-3937
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

TLC Laser Eye Centers
Suite 101
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-9562
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Diamond Y. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tam ( CPSO# 87388 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Eyecare
Unit 1
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 820-3937

Business Address:
Suite 605
7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
Suite 101
50 Burnhamthorpe West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone Number: (905) 848-9562

Business Address:
Suite 207
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013 Active
             Dr.  Diamond  Yat Fai Tam may practise medicine independently in ophthalmology,
            only.