skip to content

Tam, Andrea Wing Kwan

CPSO#: 98272

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Pediatrics
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-720-2000 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Marie-Curie Pvt
Ottawa ON  K1N 1A2
Canada
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

4289 Innes Rd
East Ottawa Kids Covid Care Clinic
Orléans ON  K1E 0A8
Canada
Phone: 6135664470
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:09 Jun 2021 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA WING KWAN TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2021