skip to content

Tallim, Gibran Aslim

CPSO#: 30203

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Nov 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006