skip to content

Talikowska-Szymczak, Ewa Maria

CPSO#: 100509

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519) 824-1010 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Szymczak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Talikowska-Szymczak ( CPSO# 100509)
Dr. P. Szymczak ( CPSO# 87028 )

Business Address:
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Business Address:
160 St. David Street South
Fergus ON  N1M 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 787-1800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EWA MARIA TALIKOWSKA-SZYMCZAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALIKOWSKA-SZYMCZAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018