skip to content

Talbot-Hamon, Catherine

CPSO#: 99234

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jan 2016