skip to content

Talati, Hetal Hitesh

CPSO#: 87205

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Gujarat University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3992
Fax: (705) 876-5008 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. H. Talati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Talati ( CPSO# 87205 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HETAL HITESH TALATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - General Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012