skip to content

Takrouri, Heba Sadeq Rabah

CPSO#: 92281

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Jordan, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Radiology
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75298 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alnassar and Takrouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alnassar ( CPSO# 87135 )
Dr. H. Takrouri ( CPSO# 92281 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Corporation Name: Heba Takrouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alnassar ( CPSO# 87135 )
Dr. H. Takrouri ( CPSO# 92281 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Radiology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z6
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Jordan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 23 Nov 2009 to 03 Feb 2010
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 04 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2019 Active
 Dr.  Heba Sadeq Raba Takrouri may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.