Takhar, Simran Singh (CPSO#: 97918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Square Doctors
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone: (905) 455-1331
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simran Takhar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Takhar ( CPSO# 97918 )

Business Address:
Queen Square Doctors
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone Number: (905) 455-1331

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMRAN SINGH TAKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014