skip to content

Takhar, Amitoj Kaur

CPSO#: 86855

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Bath, Amitoj Kaur (used until: 23 Feb 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Lucknow, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 18
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: 905 319 2000
Fax: 905 319 6292 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amitoj Takhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Takhar ( CPSO# 86855 )

Business Address:
1960 Appleby Line
Suite 18
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 319-2000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMITOJ KAUR TAKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2009