skip to content

Takach, Sarah Leslie

CPSO#: 98775

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Apr 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 660
3773 6th Ln
Ohsweken ON  N0A 1M0
Phone: (905) 765-2442
Fax: 905-765-2872 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Takach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH LESLIE TAKACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2018