skip to content

Takach Lapner, Sarah Louise Dunbar

CPSO#: 84741

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Names: Lapner, Sarah Louise Dunbar Takach (used until: 15 Jun 2012 )     Takach, Sarah Louise Dunbar (used until: 25 Nov 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 28 Feb 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015