Tak, Auzair Ahmed (CPSO#: 96902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: (519) 804-9234
Fax: (519) 804-2604
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Auzair Tak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tak ( CPSO# 96902 )

Business Address:
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-2100

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUZAIR AHMED TAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2012 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2013