skip to content

Tahir, Fadwah Hamzah Abd Alhamid

CPSO#: 87788

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Oct 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:31 Aug 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective:09 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 10 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 09 Oct 2009
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Oct 2009