skip to content

Taheri-Anaraki, Atousa

CPSO#: 88092

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 High Tech Rd
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4R2
Phone: 905-709-4274
Fax: (905) 709-4985 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

700-200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9L3
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-2100
Fax: (905) 856-2102
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2900 Warden Ave
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-499-5964
Fax: 416-491-5839
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Atousa Taheri-Anaraki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Taheri-Anaraki ( CPSO# 88092 )

Business Address:
200 Windflower Gate
Suite 700
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9L3
Phone Number: (905) 856-2100

Business Address:
245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 488-1455

Business Address:
301 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4R2
Phone Number: (905) 709-4985

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ATOUSA TAHERI-ANARAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHERI-ANARAKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2010