Taheri, Sepideh (CPSO#: 99476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Dec 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC, Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Room B1-133
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N5A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 56075
Fax: (519) 685-8156
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Springbank Medical Centre
460 Springbank Drive, Suite 206
London ON  N6J 0A8
Canada
Phone: (519) 641-8687
Fax: (519) 641-6518
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Oct 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sepideh Taheri may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Taheri
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Taheri  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Taheri's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Taheri's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on December 19, 2013, and expires on June 30,
                  2019.  Upon renewal of Dr. Taheri's academic appointment at the
                  University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject
                  to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.