Taheri, Amir Yousef (CPSO#: 100042)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Semnan University of Medical Sciences an, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 08 Apr 2013 to 05 May 2013
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 13 Jan 2014 to 26 Jan 2014
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Jan 2014 to 09 Feb 2014
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2017