skip to content

Taerk, Gary Stephen

CPSO#: 29238

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
300 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1S4
Phone: (416) 969-9795 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Taerk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Taerk ( CPSO# 29238 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
300 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1S4
Phone Number: (416) 969-9795

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GARY STEPHEN TAERK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAERK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1977
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.