skip to content

Tadros, Shaheer

CPSO#: 32658

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Box 202
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73372
Fax: (613) 739-6988 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shaheer Tadros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tadros ( CPSO# 32658 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Box 202
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAHEER TADROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TADROS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1986