First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Sep 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |