skip to content

Tabassum, Farah

CPSO#: 90227

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016
EXPIRY DATE
11 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of the Punjab, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:13 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Feb 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016