skip to content

Tabari, Mohammad

CPSO#: 87032

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
414 - 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 439-2662 Ext. 2
Fax: (416) 439-2552 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Tabari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tabari ( CPSO# 87032 )

Business Address:
414-3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 439-2662

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:07 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD TABARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Trauma General Surgery

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Trauma General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Trauma General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010