skip to content

Ta-Min, Wee Foh

CPSO#: 23464

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Oct 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Tai-Min, Wee Foh (used until: 22 Mar 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:University of Leeds, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Oct 1995