skip to content

Rubaiyyat, Tania

CPSO#: 81377

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Dhaka, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Byron Family Medical Centre
1228 Commissioners Road West
London, ON, N6K1C7
London ON  N6K1C7
Phone: (519) 472-9670
Fax: (519) 657-1766 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rubaiyyat & Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rubaiyyat ( CPSO# 81377 )
Dr. S. Rahman ( CPSO# 92205 )

Business Address:
1228 Commissioners Rd W
Byron Family Medical Centre
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON  N6K 1C7

Business Address:
St Joseph Family Medical Centre
PO Box 5777
STN B
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 672-9660

Business Address:
Highbury Medical Clinic Inc
1345 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 2E3
Phone Number: (519) 659-2331

Business Address:
1135 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 5K7
Phone Number: (519) 438-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TANIA RUBAIYYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBAIYYAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006