skip to content

Pararajasingam, Thevaki

CPSO#: 93034

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Jan 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Valpar Medical Clinic
9275 Markham Road Unit 1A-1
Markham, Ontario
L6E 1A2
Markham ON  L6E 1A2
Phone: (905) 554-4500
Fax: 905-554-4700 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pararajasingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pararajasingam ( CPSO# 93034 )

Business Address:
Unit 1A-1
9275 Markham Road
Markham ON  L6E 1A2
Phone Number: (905) 554-4500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013 Active
             Dr.  Thevaki  Pararajasingam  may  practise  medicine  independently  in family
            medicine, only.