skip to content

Olynych, Timothy John

CPSO#: 96545

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 110
2935 Conroy Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 6C6
Phone: (613) 725-2113
Fax: (613) 725-0317 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital-General Site
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613 7985555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Timothy Olynych Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Olynych ( CPSO# 96545 )
Dr. E. Cordeiro ( CPSO# 98640 )

Business Address:
110 - 2935 Conroy Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 6C6
Phone Number: (613) 725-2113


Corporation Name: Dr. Erin Cordeiro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Olynych ( CPSO# 96545 )
Dr. E. Cordeiro ( CPSO# 98640 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 27 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN OLYNYCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLYNYCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 18 Jul 2011 to 07 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 08 Aug 2011 to 26 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2014