skip to content

McCormick, Thomas Jared

CPSO#: 110229

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Feb 2019
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Feb 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Rd, Room 2044
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: (587) 580-6817 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lindsay McCormick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. McCormick ( CPSO# 87384 )
Dr. T. McCormick ( CPSO# 110229)

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2019 Active
             Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Thomas  Jared  McCormick  shall practise medicine as required by the
                  postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. McCormick is enrolled
                  at the University of Ottawa.

            (2)   In  Dr.  McCormick's  practice  in  the  postgraduate  medical  education
                  program, Dr. McCormick shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-
                  patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                  department where Dr. McCormick is properly  practising  medicine  and  to
                  which  postgraduate  trainees are regularly assigned by the department as
                  part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In  Dr.  McCormick's  practice  in  the  postgraduate  medical  education
                  program, Dr. McCormick shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. McCormick may practise adult critical care medicine and to the extent
                  of his employment at the  University  of  Ottawa  Heart Institute Ottawa,
                  while  under supervision coordinated by a supervisor  acceptable  to  the
                  College.

            (5)   In Dr. McCormick's practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. McCormick may
                  not charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate   of  registration  expires,  and  Dr.  McCormick  must
                  thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical
                  education program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when  Dr.  McCormick   is  no  longer  enrolled  in  a  program  of
                        postgraduate medical education  provided  by  a  medical  school in
                        Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr. McCormick no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a  valid  employment authorization under the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically  converts   to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education  certificate  and  Dr.  McCormick must  immediately  cease  all
                  practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of
                  the following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified  in paragraph (4) notifies the College of
                        any concerns regarding Dr. McCormick's  practice, including but not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,   skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. McCormick's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   McCormick  to  engage in practice outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when  Dr.  McCormick's  employment as specified  in  paragraph  (4)
                        ceases; or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. McCormick takes a  leave of absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the postgraduate  education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In  the  event  of  conversion   to   a  regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7) or expiry  of  the  certificate  under
                  paragraph (7), Dr. McCormick may  not  resume  any  practice  outside the
                  postgraduate  medical education program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. McCormick applies for a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This certificate  is  issued  on  February  6,  2019.  In accordance with
                  paragraph  6(a),  this certificate of registration expires  on  June  30,
                  2020. All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice  outside  the   postgraduate   medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.