T Didomenicantonio, David (CPSO#: 99269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hôpital de Gatineau
909 Boulevard La Vérendrye
Gatineau QC  J8P 7H2
Phone: (819) 966-6100 Ext. 3000
Fax: (819) 966-6198

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID T DIDOMENICANTONIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. T DIDOMENICANTONIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2012 to 21 Sep 2012
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2015