skip to content

Chia, Tze Luck

CPSO#: 93557

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: (905) 707-0616 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. T. Chia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chia ( CPSO# 93557 )

Business Address:
120 - 7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone Number: (905) 707-1777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TZE LUCK CHIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 29 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2015
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.