skip to content

Burns, Timothy James Robert

CPSO#: 28287

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Oct 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2000

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Timothy J. Burns Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Burns ( CPSO# 28287 )

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JAMES ROBERT BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Nov 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2000