skip to content

Szlanta, Agata

CPSO#: 87343

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K1A 1L1
Phone: (613) 437-5020 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

752 King Street West
Kingston K7L 4X3
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-4900
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Agata Szlanta Medecine Societe Professionelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Szlanta ( CPSO# 87343 )

Business Address:
300 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K1A 1L1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AGATA SZLANTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZLANTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2009

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 1, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)