Szentgyorgyi, Eva Maria (CPSO#: 42381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LifeLabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone: (416) 675-4530
Fax: 416 213-4206
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eva M. Szentgyorgyi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Szentgyorgyi ( CPSO# 42381 )

Business Address:
Life Labs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 22 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVA MARIA SZENTGYORGYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZENTGYORGYI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1990