skip to content

Sze, Jacqueline Yi Ming

CPSO#: 84711

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit J
1225 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 4Y1
Phone: (416) 431-8135
Fax: (416) 431-8233 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sze Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sze ( CPSO# 84711 )

Business Address:
Unit J
1225 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 4Y1
Phone Number: (416) 431-8135

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE YI MING SZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011