skip to content

Szatmari, Peter

CPSO#: 29865

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
Intergenerational Wellness Building
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Div
80 Workman Way, 5th Floor, Rm 5226
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34856
Fax: 416-979-6820 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. P. Szatmari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Szatmari ( CPSO# 29865 )

Business Address:
CAMH
80 Workman Way
5th Floor, Suite 5226
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501


Corporation Name: Woodbury-Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER SZATMARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZATMARI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1978