skip to content

Symonette, Caitlin Jane

CPSO#: 98025

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC- Victoria Campus
E2-631
800 Commissioners Road E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 76757
Fax: 519-667-6761 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Caitlin Symonette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Symonette ( CPSO# 98025 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare London
Division of Plastic Surgery
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:01 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAITLIN JANE SYMONETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYMONETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 08 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 02 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2019