skip to content

Sylvain, Josee Elizabeth

CPSO#: 97881

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury, Ontario
K6A 3G5
Hawkesbury ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 632-1111 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEE ELIZABETH SYLVAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYLVAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2016