skip to content

Syed, Zohair Hasan

CPSO#: 93628

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7580 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 259-6671
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Zohair Syed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Syed ( CPSO# 93628 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7580

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to botain a copy of their medical records can contact DocuDavit at: 1-888-781-9083.
Date Received: 21 Mar 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZOHAIR HASAN SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 10 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012