skip to content

Ali, Syed Nasir

CPSO#: 63113

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Sep 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1992

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
168 Essex Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 4R9
Phone: (519) 337-7535
Fax: (519) 337-7536 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

450 Central Ave
103
London ON  N6B 2E8
Canada
Phone: 5193377535
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. N. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ali ( CPSO# 63113 )

Business Address:
168 Essex Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 4R9
Phone Number: (519) 337-7535


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SYED NASIR ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1992

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Dec 2021
Summary:

On December 11, 2019, allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Ali were 
referred to the Discipline Committee of the College, now the Ontario Physicians and 
Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.  
 
The Notice of Hearing alleged Dr. Ali had committed an act of professional misconduct 
under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 
1991 (“O. Reg. 856/93”), in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and under 
paragraph 1(1)34 of O. Reg. 856/93 in that he has engaged in conduct unbecoming a 
physician. The allegations related to Dr. Ali’s interactions and relationship with a 
professional colleague, the complainant. 
The Tribunal heard the matter on November 9-13, 2020, February 24-26, 2021, March 8, 
9 and 12, 2021 and April 13 and 26, 2021, by videoconference. Counsel for both the 
College and Dr. Ali attended the hearing. After a contested hearing on the merits, the 
OPSDT reserved its decision.  
On December 9, 2021, the OPSDT released its decision finding that Dr. Ali committed an 
act of professional misconduct by sexually assaulting the complainant in 1999, in that 
he engaged in conduct that was disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional and in that 
he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician. The OPSDT further found that Dr. Ali 
engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional misconduct in participating in 
the complainant’s privilege dispute with a hospital when he had a conflict of interest 
arising from the fact he had sexually assaulted the complainant.  
A penalty hearing before the OPSDT will be scheduled.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Motion: May 22, 2020 Hearing: November 9 to13, 2020 February 24 to 26, 2021, March 8 & 9 and 12, 2021 April 13 & 26, 2021 Penalty Hearing Date: March 11, 2022