skip to content

Syed, Atyab Abbas Naqvi

CPSO#: 85241

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Apr 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
207 - 10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone: 905 794 4497
Fax: 905 794 7258 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

5734 Yonge Street, 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Canada
Phone: 416-222-5501
Fax: 416-222-1932
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Atyab Syed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Syed ( CPSO# 85241 )

Business Address:
207-10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 794-4497

Business Address:
4 - 45 Hannover Drive
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 684-9999

Business Address:
5734 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2M 4E7
Phone Number: (416) 222-5501


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ATYAB ABBAS NAQVI SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 12 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 13 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 24 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2018