First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1967 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Feb 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Feb 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jun 2009 |