skip to content

Swett Cosentino, Jossie Mercedes

CPSO#: 91289

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Catholic University of Santiago de Guaya, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13 Garden St
Brockville ON  K6V 2B8
Phone: (613) 499-2102
Fax: (613) 499-2103 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSSIE MERCEDES SWETT COSENTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWETT COSENTINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Dec 2009
AVP - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 28 Dec 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016