skip to content

Swensson-Rosenquist, Gerrard Eric

CPSO#: 17530

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Winchester District Memorial Hospital 566 Louise Street Winchester ON K0C 2K0
Date Received: 24 Mar 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1960
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2001
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Oct 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016