skip to content

Swekla, Michaela

CPSO#: 97111

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, German, Slovak

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2333 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Swekla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Swekla ( CPSO# 97111 )

Business Address:
3482 Woodhurst Cres
Mississauga ON  L5L 1N4
Phone Number: 9055983852


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Dec 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active
 Dr.  Michaela  Swelka may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine,
            as a hospitalist, only.