skip to content

Swartzentruber, Shannon Clark

CPSO#: 86859

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Community Health Ctre
363 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3S 3N2
Phone: (519) 754-0777
Fax: (519) 754-0757 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard Hilsden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hilsden ( CPSO# 84915 )
Dr. S. Swartzentruber ( CPSO# 86859 )

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Campbellford ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
Londesborough ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3269

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHANNON CLARK SWARTZENTRUBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWARTZENTRUBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010