skip to content

Swart, Maritza

CPSO#: 86984

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of General Surgery
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211 Ext. 0 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suit 102
333 Athlone Ave
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Canada
Phone: (519) 290-0192
Fax: (519) 290-0957
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Swart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Swart ( CPSO# 86984 )

Business Address:
102 - 333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 290-0192

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Department of General Surgery
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:06 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARITZA SWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014