skip to content

Swan, Kathryn Michelle

CPSO#: 87161

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 Plains Rd E
Burlington ON  L7T 2E2
Phone: 9056357313
Fax: 9056352464 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHRYN MICHELLE SWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010